Chung, Arthur Guozhi (CPSO#: 84241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Oak Medical Clinic
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582-7533
Fax: (905) 582-0766
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Canada
Phone: (519) 753-8666
Fax: (519) 753-6880
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 12 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Chung ( CPSO# 84241 )

Business Address:
West Oak Medical Clinic
2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-7533

Business Address:
Avenue Medical Centre
221 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3J2
Phone Number: (519) 753-8666

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 15 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR GUOZHI CHUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHUNG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011