Cina, Claudio (CPSO#: 54822)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Catania, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. S. Cina Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 23 2013


Corporation Name: Dr. Laura L. Whiteacre Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Whiteacre ( CPSO# 52113 )
Dr. C. Cina ( CPSO# 54822 )

Business Address:
2115 Finch Avenue West
Suite 411
North York ON  M3N 2V6
Phone Number: (416) 740-3949

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2013