Clark, William Foster (CPSO#: 28129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
A2-343
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8361
Fax: (519) 685-8047
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W.F. Clark Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Clark ( CPSO# 28129 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM FOSTER CLARK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLARK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1976