Cleminson, Douglas Michael (CPSO#: 57298)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
W C A 360
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: 1-613-969-9556
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cleminson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cleminson ( CPSO# 57298 )

Business Address:
265 Dundas Street East
Suite W C A 360
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-9556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS MICHAEL CLEMINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLEMINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1998