Clifford, Matthew Sean Akira (CPSO#: 110896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  08 Mar 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Sep 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Lyndoch Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone: (519) 862-1461
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Matthew Clifford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Clifford ( CPSO# 110896)

Business Address:
348 Lyndoch Street
Corunna ON  N0N 1G0
Phone Number: (519) 862-1461

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Sep 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 08 Mar 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Sep 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Matthew Sean Akira Clifford may practise family medicine at 348
                  Lyndoch Street in Corunna, Ontario, while under supervision coordinated
                  by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Clifford's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College by the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the supervisor is no longer able or willing to continue to
                        supervise Dr. Clifford's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of  Dr. Clifford's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on September 9, 2016, and will expire on or
                  before March 8, 2018, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.