Cluff, Stephen John (CPSO#: 52451)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905 895 4521 Ext. 6619
Fax: 905 853 2206
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stephen J. Cluff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cluff ( CPSO# 52451 )
Dr. A. Cluff ( CPSO# 100245)

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN JOHN CLUFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CLUFF is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1986