Coady, John Edward (CPSO#: 58592)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
274 Dundas St East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 969-7743
Fax: (613) 969-7744
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Coady Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Coady ( CPSO# 58592 )

Business Address:
Suite 204
274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 969-7743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN EDWARD COADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COADY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Sep 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Nov 1988