Coates, David Charles (CPSO#: 57015)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1249 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2M5
Phone: (519) 736-8600
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Coates Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 11 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Coates ( CPSO# 57015 )

Business Address:
1249 Front Road South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 2M5
Phone Number: (519) 736-8600

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital-Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Jun 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Jun 2012 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 22, 2012, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. David Charles Coates,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Coates to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Coates has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to
                  the following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the
                  corresponding regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized
                  as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished       Not Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X

            Monitored Drugs                            
            (from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term
             Care List of Monitored Drugs,
             and as updated from time to time)         X