Cohen, Eve Kathleen (CPSO#: 33231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 May 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 4130
Santa Fe NM  87502
United States
Phone: (505) 470-5380
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sudbury Imaging Specialists
P O Box 702
Sudbury ON  P3E 4R6
Canada
Phone: (705) 671-5120
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - New Mexico

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVE KATHLEEN COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1985