Cohen, Steven Neill (CPSO#: 87382)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1001 Queen Street West
Unit 1 - 112
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32132
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven N. Cohen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cohen ( CPSO# 87382 )

Business Address:
Unit 3-4
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 471-4408

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN NEILL COHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007