Cohen-Nehemia, Gideon (CPSO#: 65598)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
H 410
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6077
Fax: (416) 480-6072
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cohen-Nehemia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Cohen-Nehemia ( CPSO# 65598 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
H-405
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6077

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 19 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIDEON COHEN-NEHEMIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHEN-NEHEMIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Resident 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Resident 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993