Coholic, Andrea Ann (CPSO#: 68978)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131 Ext. 6345
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daryl Brain and Andrea Coholic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Brain ( CPSO# 69083 )
Dr. A. Coholic ( CPSO# 68978 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-6340

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA ANN COHOLIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COHOLIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1998