Colby, William David (CPSO#: 54111)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham-Kent Public Health Unit
435 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7L 3Z4
Phone: (519) 352-7270 Ext. 2500
Fax: (519) 352-2166
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

50 King Street
London ON  N6A 5L7
Canada
Phone: (519) 663-3396
Fax: (519) 663-3977
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 01 Dec 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM DAVID COLBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Medical Microbiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985