Cole, Arthur Frederick David (CPSO#: 19209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Sep 1967

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Nov 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone: (416) 489-8088
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. F. David Cole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Cole ( CPSO# 19209 )

Business Address:
301 - 40 Holly Street
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1964
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 May 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Nov 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Nov 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As from November 28, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Arthur Cole, in
            accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cole to the College of
            Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        Clinical Restrictions
                  
                  3.    I, Dr. Cole, undertake to restrict my anaesthesia practice in the
                        following ways:
                  
                  (a)   I may only provide the following limited anaesthesia services:
                  
                        i.    local standby anaesthesia; 
                        ii.   local anaesthesia with sedation; and/or
                        iii.  sedation,
                  
                        in which the patient is breathing independently;  
                  
                  (b)   for further clarity, but without limiting the generality of
                        subparagraph (3)1(a) above:  
                        i.    I will not administer, nor be the most responsible physician
                              with respect to the administering of, any nerve blocks
                              whatsoever including, 
                              but not limited to, spinal and epidural anaesthetics;
                  
                        ii.   I will not administer, nor be the most responsible physician
                              with respect to the administering of, any general anaesthesia
                              whatsoever; and
                  
                        iii.  for the purposes of subparagraph (3)1(b)(ii) above, general
                              anaesthesia shall include any sedation that requires any form
                              of airway instrumentation (for example, laryngeal mask airway
                              or endotracheal intubation).