Colleton, Michael James (CPSO#: 71284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6th Floor
3250 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2X9
Phone: (647) 775-1650
Fax: (866) 232-8139
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

A Grenville & William Davis Court
CMHA Peel Office
7755 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6W 4T6
Canada
Phone: (905) 456-4700 Ext. 5663
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Toronto South Detention Centre
Health Care
160 Horner Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 4X8
Canada
Phone: (416) 354-4030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Roy McMurtry Youth Centre
Health Care
8500 McLaughlin Road South
Brampton ON  L6Y 0N6
Canada
Phone: (905) 454-5000 Ext. 5402
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Colleton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Colleton ( CPSO# 71284 )

Business Address:
Canadian Mental Health Association
Peel Branch
Suite 314
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3

Business Address:
Roy McMurtry Youth Centre
Health Care Department
8500 McLaughlin Road South
Brampton ON  L6Y 0N6
Phone Number: (905) 454-5000

Business Address:
A. Grenville & William Davis Courthouse
Mental Health Diversion
3rd Floor
7755 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6W 4T6
Phone Number: (905) 456-4700

Business Address:
Toronto South Detention Centre
160 Homer Avenue
Toronto ON  M8Z 4X8

Business Address:
600 - 3250 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2X9
Phone Number: (647) 775-1650

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES COLLETON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLETON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002