Collin, Gerard Albert (CPSO#: 29125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Nov 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Phenix clinic
Radiology
595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: 819-360-5155
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 140
4 Taschereau St
Gatineau QC  J8Y 2V5
Canada
Phone: 819-776-5029
Fax: 819-776-3917
County: 
Electoral District: 

Suite 214
O B S P
1419 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 728-6508
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD ALBERT COLLIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLLIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 11 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2007