Colmenares, Maria Ester (CPSO#: 58684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 2712
Fax: 905-853-2217
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maria Colmenares Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Colmenares ( CPSO# 58684 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Center
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA ESTER COLMENARES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLMENARES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2003