Colwill, Richard Wayne (CPSO#: 58335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite B 2206
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V1
Phone: (416) 439-5866
Fax: (416) 439-8776
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Colwill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Colwill ( CPSO# 58335 )

Business Address:
B-2206 - 3000 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V1
Phone Number: (416) 439-5866

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 18 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WAYNE COLWILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLWILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1988

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: July 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)