Comay, Daniel Clive (CPSO#: 73596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 314
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone: (905) 681-2036
Fax: (905) 681-3740
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dan Comay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Comay ( CPSO# 73596 )

Business Address:
Burlington Professional Centre
314 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington ON  L7N 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 681-2036

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Nov 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL CLIVE COMAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2003