Common, Andrew Ainslie (CPSO#: 59024)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Oct 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-5680
Fax: (416) 864-5380
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Deva ( CPSO# 93514 )
Dr. G. Mnatzakanian ( CPSO# 88831 )
Dr. J. Barfett ( CPSO# 84352 )
Dr. A. Zalev ( CPSO# 24495 )
Dr. D. Sarma ( CPSO# 76653 )
Dr. V. Prabhudesai ( CPSO# 81446 )
Dr. D. Pearce ( CPSO# 65503 )
Dr. L. Noel De Tilly ( CPSO# 62846 )
Dr. D. Muradali ( CPSO# 59826 )
Dr. W. Montanera ( CPSO# 31960 )
Dr. T. Marotta ( CPSO# 53911 )
Dr. D. Marcuzzi ( CPSO# 54207 )
Dr. W. Mak ( CPSO# 85186 )
Dr. A. Kirpalani ( CPSO# 74950 )
Dr. B. Gray ( CPSO# 58202 )
Dr. F. Goldberg ( CPSO# 50752 )
Dr. T. Dowdell ( CPSO# 55456 )
Dr. A. Bharatha ( CPSO# 79389 )
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )
Dr. E. Colak ( CPSO# 79512 )
Dr. P. Vlachou ( CPSO# 90004 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Common Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Common ( CPSO# 59024 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
30 Bond Street
Room 3-145CC
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5680

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREW AINSLIE COMMON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COMMON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1988