Condrut, George Mihai (CPSO#: 80669)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palladium Medical Clinic
Suite 210
308 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone: (613) 599-3422
Fax: (613) 599-6922
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Condrut Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Condrut ( CPSO# 80669 )

Business Address:
Palladium Medical Clinic
Suite 210
308 Palladium Drive
Kanata ON  K2V 1A1
Phone Number: (613) 599-3422

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE MIHAI CONDRUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONDRUT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006