Connelly, Robert John (CPSO#: 62423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jan 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Doran 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6046
Fax: (613) 548-1369
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: 613-544-3310
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert J. Connelly, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Connelly ( CPSO# 62423 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6046

Business Address:
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 28 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT JOHN CONNELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONNELLY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1999