Conway, James Bernard (CPSO#: 61660)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Site
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carlilng Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
General Site
Department of Anesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Suite 404
240 Catherine Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2G8
Canada
Phone: (613) 234-1211
Fax: (613) 234-7066
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Site
Department of Anaesthesia
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 82247
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Suite 308
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Canada
Phone: (613) 521-3223
Fax: (613) 521-6017
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1081 Carling Avenue
Suite # 207
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 729-3174
Fax: (613) 729-1026
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1655 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 6M7
Canada
Phone: (613) 739-5437
Fax: (613) 739-5432
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Billings Bridge Plaza
2269 Riverside Drive
Units 7 & 8
Ottawa ON  K1H 8K2
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-4944
Fax: (613) 737-3342
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Suite 3105
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Gastrointestinal Institute
1910 St Laurent Blvd
Unit 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Canada
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Fax: (613) 248-9009
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

# 606 - 1545 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8P9
Canada
Phone: (613) 729-5700
Fax: (613) 729-5463
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Conway Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Conway ( CPSO# 61660 )

Business Address:
Department of Anaesthesia
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
B310 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Suite B310
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Suite 3105
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
404 - 240 Catherine Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 2G8
Phone Number: (613) 234-1211

Business Address:
1545 Carling Avenue
Suite 606
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8P9
Phone Number: (613) 729-5700

Business Address:
1919 Riverside Drive
Suite 308
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 521-3223

Business Address:
1655 Kilborn Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 6M7
Phone Number: (613) 739-5437

Business Address:
1081 Carling Avenue
Suite 208
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 729-3179

Business Address:
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Suite 29
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone Number: (613) 686-6656

Business Address:
Suite B310
249C - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES BERNARD CONWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CONWAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1989