Cook, Deborah Joanne (CPSO#: 55326)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-4941 Ext. 33633
Fax: (905) 308-7223
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Deborah J. Cook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cook ( CPSO# 55326 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Healthcare
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 525-9140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH JOANNE COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1987