Cook, Douglas James (CPSO#: 81003)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Feb 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Room 304 Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3696
Fax: (613) 548-1346
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D.J. Cook Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cook ( CPSO# 81003 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Room 304 Victory 3
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JAMES COOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 2013