Cooligan, Terrance Gregory (CPSO#: 32375)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 May 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Ext. 82111
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. T. Cooligan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Cooligan ( CPSO# 32375 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TERRANCE GREGORY COOLIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOLIGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1981