Coome, Grant Edward Arthur (CPSO#: 76415)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site Room E1 102
Emergency Medicine Associates
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 76538
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Urgent Care Clinic
268 Grosvenors Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Beaton Coome Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Coome ( CPSO# 76415 )
Dr. M. Beaton ( CPSO# 74849 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Univeristy Hospital
A10-223 - 339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3344

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
E1-102 - 800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 667-6538

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenors Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRANT EDWARD ARTHUR COOME may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOME is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2003