Cooper, Steven Martin (CPSO#: 53917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1072 Doran Road
Pembroke ON  K8A 6W7
Phone: (613) 687-8107
Fax: (613) 687-5739
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven M. Cooper Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Cooper ( CPSO# 53917 )

Business Address:
1072 Doran Road
Pembroke ON  K8A 6W7
Phone Number: (613) 687-8107

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN MARTIN COOPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COOPER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1985