Copeland, Julie Anne (CPSO#: 79402)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
R R 5
22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. A. Copeland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Copeland ( CPSO# 79402 )

Business Address:
Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road
Mount Brydges ON  N0L 1W0
Phone Number: (519) 264-2800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE COPELAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COPELAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005