Costa, Giuseppe (CPSO#: 86293)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Mar 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Mar 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Division of Orthopedic Surgery
11 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: (416) 461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Athletes Care Sport Medicine Clinic
Suite C-120
11 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5H 4C7
Canada
Phone: 416-368-9990
Fax: 416-479-8688
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Athletes Care Sport Medicine Clinic
Suite LL01
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Canada
Phone: (416) 544-9065
Fax: (416) 479-8688
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Toronto Clinic
Suite 2000, East tower
55 Avenue Road
Toronto ON  M5R 3L2
Canada
Phone: (416) 849-5555
Fax: (416) 849-5551
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Pinnacle Health Sciences Centre
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Canada
Phone: (905) 883-6614
Fax: (905) 883-6904
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Niagara Health
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
Phone: (705) 743-2121
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 09 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIUSEPPE COSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COSTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2011 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Jul 2012 to 21 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2016