Cote, Peter Bernard (CPSO#: 63116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Mar 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter Cote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 30 2015


Corporation Name: Peter Cote Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Mar 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Mar 2017 Active View Details [+]

            As from March 25, 2017, the followingis imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Peter Bernard Cote,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Cote to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Cote has ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Dec 2017
Summary:

On December 8, 2017, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Peter Bernard Cote committed 
an act of professional misconduct, in that has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant 
to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all of the circumstances, would reasonably be 
regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonorable, or unprofessional. 
 
Dr. Cote is a family medicine specialist who, during the relevant period of time, was practising 
in  Manitouwadge, District  of  Thunder  Bay. He graduated from  McGill  University’s  medical 
school  in  1988 and was  granted  a  certificate  of  registration  authorizing  independent  practice 
from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (“the College”) in September 1990. Dr. 
Cote held hospital privileges at the Manitouwadge General Hospital. 
    
Physician Health Program  
 
On November 14, 2012, Dr. Cote entered into a 3-year monitoring contract with the Physician 
Health Program  (“PHP”) as  resolution  to  an incapacity matter. On June 4, 2014, the College 
received a monitoring report from Dr. Cote's PHP Case Manager outlining concerns with respect 
to Dr. Cote's adherence to the contract, including one missed urine screen; one positive urine 
screen and insufficient attendance with his treating clinician. 
    
Undertaking with the College 
 
This information led to Dr. Cote entering into an Undertaking with the College in November 
2014, whereby he agreed that if he failed to comply with his PHP Contract “…such action may 
constitute a breach of this undertaking, and an act of professional misconduct.”   
    
On January 2, 2015, the College received the PHP's second annual report, stating that Dr. Cote 
had breached terms of his contract, including through supplementing prescription medicine with 
samples from his office when he ran out of his prescription medications.  
 
Termination of PHP Contract 
 
On June 18, 2015, information was received from the PHP that Dr. Cote failed to abide by the 
terms of his undertaking to this PHP, including missed appointments with his primary monitor 
on March 10 and April 13, 2015; no response to attempts to re-establish contact and failure to 
follow through with a referral to a therapist. Dr. Cote did not reach out to his family doctor or the 
PHP Clinical  Coordinator  when  he  experienced  a  reoccurrence  of  some of  his  mental  health 
symptoms. Due  to  continued  non-compliance  with  the  PHP  monitoring  agreement, the  PHP 
suspended and subsequently terminated Dr. Cote’s contract. 
 
Cease to Practice 
 
On March 25, 2017, in the context of an incapacity investigation, Dr. Cote signed a Cease to 
Practice undertaking. 
 
 
 
Disposition 
 
On December 8, 2017, the Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
-  Dr. Cote appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
-  Dr. Cote pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,500.00 within thirty (30) days of the 
   date of this Order.

Hearing Date(s): December 8, 2017

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 15, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)


Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 16, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)