Coull, Derek Justin (CPSO#: 93568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
393 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 1V2
Phone: (905) 388-4028
Fax: (905) 388-3302
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Derek Coull Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Coull ( CPSO# 93568 )

Business Address:
104 - 393 Rymal Road West
Hamilton ON  L9B 1V2
Phone Number: (905) 388-4028

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK JUSTIN COULL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COULL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012