Courtice, Richard William (CPSO#: 54345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Bay Regional Health Centre
Department Of Laboratory Medicine
50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone: (705) 474-8600 Ext. 2933
Fax: (705) 495-7988
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Barry's Bay
Ontario
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3045 Ext. 243
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls, Ontario
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6
Canada
Phone: 705-753-3110 Ext. 389
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa, Ontario
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Canada
Phone: (705) 744-6001
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Courtice Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Courtice ( CPSO# 54345 )

Business Address:
North Bay General Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
50 College Drive
PO Box 2500
North Bay ON  P1B 0A4
Phone Number: (705) 474-8600

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St. Francis Memorial Drive
Box 129
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3044

Business Address:
PO Box 70
217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa ON  P0H 1V0
Phone Number: (705) 744-5511

Business Address:
725 Coursol Road
Sturgeon Falls ON  P2B 2Y6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mattawa General Hospital Mattawa
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD WILLIAM COURTICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COURTICE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Laboratory Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1985