Coutinho, Christopher Jude (CPSO#: 80766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ford Moore Oral Surgery
235 Eagle Street Suite 201
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 853-3727
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

York Plastic Surgery
490 Harry Walker Parkway South
Units 4 and 5
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0B3
Canada
Phone: (905) 898-2519
Fax: (905) 898-7239
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Kidsworld Pediatric Dentistry
222 Wellington Street East
Suite 200
Aurora ON  L4G1J5
Canada
Phone: 905-503-5300
Fax: 905-503-5302
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher J Coutinho Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Coutinho ( CPSO# 80766 )

Business Address:
201 - 235 Eagle Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 1J8
Phone Number: (905) 853-3727

Business Address:
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
4 - 490 Harry Walker Parkway South
Newmarket ON  L3Y 0B3
Phone Number: (905) 898-2519

Business Address:
200 - 222 Wellington Street East
Aurora ON  L4G 1J5

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JUDE COUTINHO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COUTINHO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009