Coveney, Marian Lynn (CPSO#: 62781)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Lynn Coveney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: London Health Sciences Centre 800 Commissioners Road East London, ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 22 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1991
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2015