Covens, Allan Lawrence (CPSO#: 52879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
T 2051
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4026
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A.L. Covens Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Covens ( CPSO# 52879 )

Business Address:
T2051 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4378

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLAN LAWRENCE COVENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COVENS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 02 Oct 1988
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 03 Oct 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1985