Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Cowal, Catherine Ann (CPSO#: 56743)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2021 Cliff Road
Suite 303
Mississauga ON  L5A 3N7
Phone: (905) 848-3711
Fax: (905) 848-2463
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cowal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cowal ( CPSO# 56743 )

Business Address:
303 - 2021 Cliff Road
Mississauga ON  L5A 3N7
Phone Number: (905) 848-3711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ANN COWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COWAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1987