Cox, Ronald Henry (CPSO#: 60000)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Meharry Medical College, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dusk Medical Centre
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone: (905) 491-9999
Fax: (905) 456-8998
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Canada
Phone: (905) 451-9999
Fax: (905) 456-8998
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ronald H Cox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Cox ( CPSO# 60000 )

Business Address:
Dusk Medical Centre
55 Dusk Drive
Brampton ON  L6Y 5Z6
Phone Number: (905) 491-9999

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD HENRY COX may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COX is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1990