Cranmer, David John (CPSO#: 67147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Norfolk Medical Centre
85 Norfolk Street
Suite 305
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone: (519) 766-1490
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Cranmer Medicine Professional Corporaiton

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Cranmer ( CPSO# 67147 )

Business Address:
Norfolk Medical Centre
Suite 305
85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 766-1490

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN CRANMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRANMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993