Crawford, Frances Maria (CPSO#: 58724)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Centre
76 Stuart Street
Kingston, Ontario
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: 613-548-2368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frances Crawford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Crawford ( CPSO# 58724 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Empire 3
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Business Address:
1 Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 332-2825

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCES MARIA CRAWFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRAWFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1988