Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Creery, Walter David (CPSO#: 61008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3680
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Samson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Samson ( CPSO# 62549 )
Dr. W. Creery ( CPSO# 61008 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER DAVID CREERY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CREERY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1992