Creighton, Paula Ann (CPSO#: 66542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CARLISLE MEDICAL CENTRE
1493 Centre Road
PO Box 311
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone: (905) 689-3301
Fax: 905 689-5772
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

WATERDOWN FAMILY MEDICINE CLINIC
95 Hamilton Street, Unit #1
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 689-6134
Fax: 905 689-5665
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

ARGYLE MEDICAL CLINIC
245 Argyle Street, South
Caledonia ON  N3W 1K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 765-5245
Fax: 905 765-1090
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

288 Dundas St. E
Box 420
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 689-8677
Fax: 905 689-8393
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

The Caledonia Clinic
53 Argyle Street North
Caledonia ON  N3W 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905-765-5886
Fax: 905-765-7887
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 17 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA ANN CREIGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CREIGHTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2015