Crichton, Thomas Peter (CPSO#: 63381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Feb 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone: (705) 560-1018
Fax: (705) 566-7617
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas P. Crichton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Crichton ( CPSO# 63381 )

Business Address:
Suite C
960 Notre Dame Avenue
Sudbury ON  P3A 2T4
Phone Number: (705) 560-1018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS PETER CRICHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRICHTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Mar 1991 to 07 Apr 1991
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1991