Crocco, Anthony George (CPSO#: 71225)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Mar 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Mar 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-5155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Crocco Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crocco ( CPSO# 71225 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY GEORGE CROCCO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROCCO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2012