Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Crocker, Thomas Charles (CPSO#: 55446)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10 Alcorn Avenue
Suite 202
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone: (416) 968-0292
Fax: (416) 975-0129
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tom Crocker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Crocker ( CPSO# 55446 )

Business Address:
202 - 10 Alcorn Avenue
Toronto ON  M4V 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 968-0292

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS CHARLES CROCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROCKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1986