Crosby, Jacqueline Adrienne (CPSO#: 60924)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17 Bear Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 1V4
Phone: (519) 842-2101
Fax: (519) 842-9668
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alexandra Hopital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 485-1700
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 4J2
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACQUELINE ADRIENNE CROSBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSBY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 22 Nov 1996 to 30 Apr 1997
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990