Crosthwaite, Aida Ilze (CPSO#: 63844)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Level
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone: (905) 540-4433
Fax: (905) 540-4414
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aida Crosthwaite Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Crosthwaite ( CPSO# 63844 )

Business Address:
67 Kenilworth Avenue North
Upper Level
Hamilton ON  L8H 4R6
Phone Number: (905) 540-4433

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AIDA ILZE CROSTHWAITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROSTHWAITE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1992