Crowe, Anne Rosemary (CPSO#: 32280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 10 Sep 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
385 Frederick Street
Suite 16
Kitchener ON  N2H 2P2
Phone: (519) 745-7482
Fax: (519) 745-1881
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Grand River Hospital
P O Box 9056
3570 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1981
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 Sep 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 10 Sep 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 10, 2015, the following Undertaking, Acknowledgement and
            Consent by Dr. Anne Rosemary Crowe is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Crowe:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                    ("Undertaking")
                                          of
                  
                              DR. ANNE ROSEMARY CROWE
                                    ("Dr. Crowe")
                  
                                          to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                    (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   I, Dr. Crowe, certificate of registration number 32280, am a member of
                  the College. I acknowledge that I am currently the subject of a College
                  investigation bearing file #7213785 into allegations regarding my
                  clinical practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (2)   I, Dr. Crowe, understand and agree that I am bound by the terms of this
                  Undertaking from the date on which I sign. 

            (3)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        Clinical Supervisor, who is acceptable to the College (the
                        "Supervisor"), for twelve (12) months. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Supervisor(s)'s
                        undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what
                        is required of the Supervisor(s), including, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   A review of at least ten (10) of my patient charts, which
                              shall be selected by the Supervisor(s), every two weeks for
                              an initial period of two months, and subsequently every month
                              for a period of ten months;
                  
                        (ii)  In the event that ten (10) patient charts are not available
                              for review, the Supervisor may review a lesser number of
                              charts, but shall review all patient charts where narcotics
                              and/or controlled substances have been prescribed by me, save
                              and except those patients charts where the sole narcotic
                              and/or controlled substance prescribed is midazolam;
                  
                        (iii) Meeting with me at least once every two weeks, for an initial
                              period of two months, and subsequently every month for a
                              period of ten months to discuss any concerns arising from the
                              chart reviews;
                  
                        (iv)  Making recommendations to me for practice improvements;
                        (v)   Submitting written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Supervisor(s) has concerns
                              about my standard of practice; and
                  
                        (vi)  Making recommendations to me for ongoing professional
                              development.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Supervisor(s) based on the areas of concern
                        identified in the report(s) of Dr. Ann Li, dated October 28, 2014,
                        and concerns that may arise during the period of supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake to co-operate fully with the supervision of
                        my practice, conducted under this term of the Undertaking and
                        Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the recommendations of my
                        Supervisor(s), including but not limited to, any recommended
                        practice improvements and ongoing professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its terms, I shall, within twenty
                        (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Crowe, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Supervisor(s)
                        on the terms set out under subparagraphs B(3)(e) and/or (f) above,
                        I will cease practising medicine until such time as I have obtained
                        a Supervisor(s) acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Crowe, agree that if I am required to cease practice as a
                        result of subparagraph B(3)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my Certificate of Registration and said
                        term, condition and limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (4)   Prescribing Log  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Crowe, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs (the "Prescribing Log"), save and except midazolam, in the
                        form set out at Schedule "D", which will include at least the
                        following information:  
                  
                        (i)   the date of the prescription;
                  
                        (ii)  the name of the patient with chart / file number;
                  
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed;
                        (iv)  the medication dosage;
                  
                        (v)   the quantity prescribed;
                  
                        (vi)  the clinical indication for use and patient direction; and 
                  
                        (vii) physician initials.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Crowe, shall keep a copy of all prescriptions I write for
                        all Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances and all other Monitored
                        Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.
                  
                  (c)   The prescribing log shall be maintained for the period of time this
                        undertaking remains in effect.
                  
            (5)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in B(3) above
                        and Appendix "A" attached, I will submit to a Reassessment of my
                        practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected
                        by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under this term of the Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge and agree that my Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise including, but not limited to,
                        hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within fifteen (15) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake
                        to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                        fifteen (15) days of commencing practice at that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake and agree that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s)
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the terms of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Crowe, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of the Ontario Health Insurance Plan
                        ("OHIP"), the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics
                        Monitoring System ("NMS") implemented under the Narcotics Safety
                        and Awareness Act, 2010  and/or any person or institution who may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the terms of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively, and that the consent forms(s) are part of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
            (7)   I, Dr. Crowe, undertake to comply with the terms and conditions of this
                  Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any term of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge that I shall be solely responsible for payment
                  of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the terms of this Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking and that I have
                  obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this
                  Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which
                  is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991,
                  c. 18, as amended. I understand that this Undertaking shall be
                  information on the College's Register that is available to the public
                  during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (11)  I, Dr. Crowe, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

            Dr. Crowe has been the subject of a College investigation into her clinical
            practice. As a result of the investigation:

                  *     Dr. Crowe will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor
                        acceptable to the College for a period of twelve (12) months.

                  *     Dr. Crowe will maintain a prescribing log.
                  
                  *     Dr. Crowe's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by
                        the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of
                        supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (12)  I, Dr. Crowe, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the professional education set
                  out in paragraph B(4) above and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or
                  Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (13)  I, Dr. Crowe, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities approved by the College, at any hospital or Practice
                  Location where I practise or have privileges ("Chief(s) of Staff"), and
                  to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has
                  that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or
                  any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (14)  I, Dr. Crowe, give my irrevocable consent to any person who facilitates
                  my completion of the professional education set out in paragraph B(4)
                  above, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chief(s) of Staff and Assessors,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the terms of the Supervisor's undertaking set out at
                        Appendix "A";
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   which comes to his or her attention in the course of providing the
                        education set out at paragraph B(4) above and which he or she
                        reasonably believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my
                        patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 10, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Anne Rosemary Crowe to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 10, 2015:

Dr. Crowe has been the subject of a College investigation into her clinical practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Crowe will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a period of twelve (12) months.

Dr. Crowe will maintain a prescribing log.

Dr. Crowe's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of supervision.