Cruise, Charles Jerome Edwards (CPSO#: 30956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre
Department Of Anaesthesia
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7628
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.J. Cruise Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cruise ( CPSO# 30956 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 259-6671

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES JEROME EDWARDS CRUISE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CRUISE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985