Culbert, Heather Tawnya (CPSO#: 73665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bloor West Village Womens Clinic
Suite 403
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 849-4595
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heather Culbert Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Culbert ( CPSO# 73665 )

Business Address:
Bloor West Village Women's Clinic
Suite 403
2425 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone Number: (416) 849-4595

Business Address:
301-1678 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6P 1A9
Phone Number: (416) 975-9300

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER TAWNYA CULBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CULBERT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2009